ILKLEY MANOR HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF THE MANOR HOUSE AT ILKLEY, WEST YORKSHIRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE ILKLEY INHABITANTS WITH VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HERITAGE, CULTURE AND ALL ASPECTS OF THE VISUAL ARTS, MUSIC, THEATRE, DANCE AND LITERATURE; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,578 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 31 July 2017: Standard registration
- 13 April 2022: Funds received from 1047823 THE FRIENDS OF THE MANOR HOUSE
- 07 June 2022: Funds received from 1165963 JOINED-UP JAZZ
- 22 June 2022: Funds received from 1168129 THE HULL (NORTH BRANSHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT
- 07 July 2022: Funds received from 1195101 GRADE RUAN UNDER 5'S
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rathinambal Tamilselvan | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Richardson - Barlow | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Toms | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Richards | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Tilbrook | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Johnson | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANNE THOMAS | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WORSTENHOLME COCKSHOTT | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.94k | £130.80k | £79.98k | £86.66k | £73.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.61k | £73.40k | £62.84k | £77.14k | £77.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | £12.25k | £20.65k | £5.93k | £1.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FURTHERING SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR: 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF THE MANOR HOUSE AT ILKLEY, WEST YORKSHIRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL THE INHABITANTS OF ILKLEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND VISITORS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS WITH VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HERITAGE, CULTURE AND ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE VISUAL ARTS, MUSIC, THEATRE, DANCE AND LITERATURE; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, INCLUDING HERITAGE AND CULTURE, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF DISPLAYS AND EXHIBITIONS AT THE MANOR HOUSE, ILKLEY; 3.3 THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE GRADE 1 LISTED BUILDING KNOWN AS THE MANOR HOUSE, ILKLEY TOGETHER WITH ITS GARDENS AND GROUNDS, COTTAGES AND ANY OTHER ANCILLARY BUILDINGS OR ANY PARTS THEREOF AS ARE OWNED OR LEASED BY THE CHARITY AND THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF THE MANOR HOUSE AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND BEAUTY; 3.4 THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PICTURES, FURNITURE, CHATTELS, ARTEFACTS AND WORKS OF ART FOR THE TIME BEING OWNED BY OR LOANED TO THE CHARITY AND THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH ITEMS AS FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST; AND/OR 3.5 THE FACILITATION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE USE, OCCUPATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE MANOR HOUSE AT ILKLEY AND ITS CONTENTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor House Art Gallery & Museum
Castle Yard
ILKLEY
LS29 9DT
- Phone:
- 01943 607030
- Email:
- admin@ilkleymanorhouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window