LIFEWAY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Christian Church, operating through rented premises, employing a pastor and his wife. We organise meetings, including those for youth and outreach. We also give to the poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 23 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor MICHAEL ALDACO | Chair | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANE SEHR AKA B.A ACCA | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CONSTANT ANASET PGDT PGCE | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.72k | £49.25k | £48.91k | £91.90k | £73.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.99k | £31.17k | £39.05k | £56.17k | £59.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
(1) THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (ÔOBJECTSÖ) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS CONSTITUTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BOLTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN BOLTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK OR IN NEED AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN BOLTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN BOLTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Brandle Avenue
BURY
Lancashire
BL8 1DX
- Phone:
- 07957823724
- Email:
- lifewaychurchuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window