AMOR EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training children's workers. Building appropriate housing for families trapped by poverty. Equipping families with water filters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- India
- Kenya
- Laos
- Mexico
- Philippines
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 January 2018: CIO registration
- AMOR EUROPE (Previous name)
- GLOBAL YOUTH DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Little | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Wilson | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Staveley | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harley Paul Wykes | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.24k | £139.70k | £405.80k | £323.19k | £330.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.77k | £136.71k | £409.37k | £243.75k | £328.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.07k | £17.74k | £2.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 JAN 2018 AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, ACROSS THE WORLD: (1). THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (2). TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ADVANCE IN LIFE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o SKCC Cornerstone Centre
Castle Hill Avenue
FOLKESTONE
Kent
CT20 2QR
- Phone:
- 07931301701
- Email:
- john.fudge@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window