THE RUSSELL MARTIN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To impact positively upon the lives of children and young people through sport, education and opportunity. We aim to build a legacy by inspiring today for the benefit of tomorrow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£1,248,681
Donations and legacies | £627.56k | |
Charitable activities | £620.46k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £661 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,281,162
Raising funds | £4.90k | |
Charitable activities | £1.28m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £27,562 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.90k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.28m |
People

24 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUSSELL MARTIN | Chair | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Martin | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Burt | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Mercer | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Batchelor | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Watson | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bradford | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neal Young | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £461.14k | £584.80k | £715.57k | £1.12m | £1.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.54k | £521.42k | £687.79k | £1.14m | £1.28m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £64.94k | £139.59k | £27.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £6.96k | £2.13k | £263.94k | £627.56k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £455.06k | £601.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £46.37k | £47.03k | £829.27k | £620.46k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £7 | £5 | £23 | £661 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £76.40k | £64.94k | £29.48k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £97.53k | £95.55k | £1.13m | £1.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £423.88k | £592.24k | £9.79k | £4.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £11.96k | £0 | £25.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £6.38k | £12.71k | £16.43k | £12.58k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £85.80k | £130.19k | £113.89k | £107.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £26.42k | £49.36k | £51.56k | £73.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF BRIGHTON, EAST SUSSEX AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: 1. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING ACTIVITIES); 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) OF SUCH PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3. TO ENCOURAGE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE GAME OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL, OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; 4. FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Russell Martin Foundation
Bank House
Southwick Square
Southwick
BN42 4FN
- Phone:
- 01273591364
- Email:
- info@rmfoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window