LOTUSMIND TEMPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to promote the Buddhist spirits, specifically peace and happiness by remembering and practising mindful reflections as seen in the traditions of the Jogye Order of Korean Buddhism. We encourage people in England to get involved with our traditional program such as 108 prostrations, Seon Meditation, Seon Yoga, Vegetarian Temple Food, Tea Ceremony, Buddhist Art, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EUNG HEE KIM | Chair | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAY KIM | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SOON ME KANG | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.92k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.61k | £4.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST SPIRITS, SPECIFICALLY PEACE AND HAPPINESS BY REMEMBERING AND PRACTICING MINDFUL REFLECTIONS AS SEEN IN THE TRADITIONS OF THE JOGYE ORDER OF KOREAN BUDDHISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 41
Chessington Business Centre
37 Cox Lane
CHESSINGTON
KT9 1SD
- Phone:
- 02030442474
- Email:
- lotusmind12@nate.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window