FRIENDS OF BURTON MANOR GARDENS

Charity Number: 1175483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded by providing leisure and educational facilities with an emphasis on local history, horticulture and the environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £11,998
Total expenditure: £4,906

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 2017: CIO registration
  • 15 February 2020: Funds received from 701270 THE FRIENDS OF BURTON MANOR
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GAVIN HUNTER Chair 26 March 2023
None on record
Michelle Suckley Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
PETER LAWRENCE CUNNINGTON Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
NEIL JOHNSTONE Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Carole Hann Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Colin Spencer Trustee 27 September 2021
THE WIRRAL FOOTPATHS AND OPEN SPACES PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £9.82k £21.02k £18.49k £14.95k £12.00k
Total expenditure £7.45k £6.10k £13.26k £21.83k £4.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.34k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 06 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 06 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 26 March 2024 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 19 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 19 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 08 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 08 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Burton Manor Gardens
Burton Manor
Burton Village
Neston
Cheshire
CH64 5TQ
Phone:
0151 336 6154
Website:

friendsofburtonmanorgardens.chessck.co.uk