Financial history THE COMMUNITY CHURCH BURTON AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1177675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £114.47k £103.76k £151.19k £146.64k £177.38k
Total expenditure £122.36k £110.31k £120.55k £146.24k £159.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.94k £13.08k £550 £4.65k