IQRAA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Children and parents different trip during half term and school holiday. -Weekly religious and school work supports -Football and other sport activities. -EID and Ramadan celebration -Supporting families and individuals those in needs during their grieving or their difficult times. -Women's get together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEIFELISLAM MOHAMMED | Chair | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HABEBA HUSAN | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
AHMED REDI | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|||||
MUKEMBER ELIAS | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUHIDEN Ali | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.06k | £156.57k | £117.06k | £92.75k | £106.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.19k | £132.13k | £109.93k | £100.51k | £89.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE TO THE QUR’AN IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EID PRAYERS AND OTHER RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES ON SPECIAL ISLAMIC DAYS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING INSTRUCTION IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND TEACHING CLASSES IN ARABIC AND QUR’ANIC STUDIES. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60B Craven Park Road
LONDON
NW10 4AE
- Phone:
- 07380445475
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window