Financial history NIGERIAN COMMUNITY CHARITY OUTREACH SLOUGH UK

Charity number: 1177077
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £2.04k £2.04k £1.68k £1.71k £1.91k
Total expenditure £1.54k £318 £1.26k £1.02k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A