Financial history ARC ANNA'S RESCUE CENTRE

Charity number: 1175230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £62.77k £69.84k £71.78k £76.04k £80.37k
Total expenditure £45.26k £69.11k £71.46k £68.12k £80.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A