ARC ANNA'S RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the charity has had a busy year rescuing over 1200 animal all have vet checks and treatment and most are re-homed The cost of expenditures are in our accounts so to are our vets bills .Fundraising, has gone well , just done a sky dive with ten volunteers raising over 4000 pounds we also have done fairs, car boots and entertainment evenings like our drag nights
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 19 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA MASON | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Prema | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIET RIMELL | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.77k | £69.84k | £71.78k | £76.04k | £80.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.26k | £69.11k | £71.46k | £68.12k | £80.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2022
(These accounts |
24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
666 NEWPORT ROAD
RUMNEY
CARDIFF
CF3 4DF
- Phone:
- 07720641653
- Email:
- anna-mason@gmx.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window