Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SACRED HEART BUSHEY

Charity number: 1173874
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 25 June 2024 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 07 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required