Financial history FRIENDS OF SACRED HEART BUSHEY

Charity number: 1173874
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £15.32k £13.23k £17.88k £19.47k £23.06k
Total expenditure £20.58k £15.07k £11.89k £7.53k £32.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A