THE ANTHONY GOLD SOLICITORS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was established for general charitable purposes (charitable under English law).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 January 2018: Standard registration
- THE ANTHONY GOLD CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Marvin Tolentino | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Knight Mantell | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Zoe Solomon | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Hopkins | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WHITAKER | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SPINKS | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.23k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | £10.01k | £8.00k | £9.00k | £3.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anthony Gold Solicitors Llp
Cottons Centre
Cottons Lane
LONDON
SE1 2QG
- Phone:
- 02079404000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window