ALL ENGLAND DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the arts and in particular in the study, performance, appreciation and practice of the art of dance by the promotion of the education of the public in such ways as the trustees think fit, including: holding or promoting annual competitive festivals, presenting and promoting public performances, concerts and displays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 May 2018: Standard registration
- 12 October 2020: Funds received from 282834 ALL-ENGLAND DANCE COMPETITION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Brunjes | Chair | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Edward Woodcock | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ariane Hanley Simard | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Clark | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Jenni Lewin-Turner | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Gavin James Sampson | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Waldock | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Harwood | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Janice Glassman | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Redford | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathan James | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lesley TAYLOR | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicola Lewis | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £421.43k | £8.02k | £6.50k | £496.50k | £140.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £342.69k | £49.44k | £51.79k | £382.63k | £191.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (OBJECTS) IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE STUDY, PERFORMANCE, APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ART OF DANCE BY THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING: HOLDING OR PROMOTING ANNUAL COMPETITIVE FESTIVALS, PRESENTING AND PROMOTING PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, CONCERTS AND DISPLAYS, AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES AGREE SCHOLARSHIPS/MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Duffy Regan Ltd
9 Malvern Road
WORCESTER
WR2 4LE
- Phone:
- 07380350080
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window