FRIENDS OF THE MANCHESTER UNITY HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of the Elderly in a Housing Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackpool
Governance
- 23 September 1980: Standard registration
- 12 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £534 | £4.54k | £223 | £3.94k | £589 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £1.92k | £2.68k | £2.15k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 22 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 26 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 1979.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE BRITISH ISLES AND IN PARTICULAR THE AGED WHO WILL LIVE IN THE RESIDENTIAL BLOCK NOW UNDER CONSTRUCTION AT NEWHOUSE ROAD, BLACKPOOL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
THE BRITISH ISLES AND IN PARTICULAR BLACKPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window