Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER SAINT PETER

Charity Number: 1174067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £110.38k £239.42k £159.27k £187.66k £186.90k
Total expenditure £146.13k £150.05k £166.12k £247.75k £199.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.63k £28.24k N/A N/A £4.72k