THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER SAINT PETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of Chester Saint Peter has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the church: pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has the maintenance responsibilities for St Peter's Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £4,718 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 01 August 2017: Standard registration
- PCC OF CHESTER ST PETER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Richard Phillips | Chair | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Passey | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WIFFEN | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Hughes | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Norman Coates | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Patsy Coates | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Lancaster | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Anne Brocklehurst | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Godwin Hobson | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Andrews | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE FRANCIS KITE | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN DAVID ANNISON | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.38k | £239.42k | £159.27k | £187.66k | £186.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.13k | £150.05k | £166.12k | £247.75k | £199.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.63k | £28.24k | N/A | N/A | £4.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARISH OFFICE
St. Peters Church
Watergate Street
CHESTER
CH1 2LA
- Phone:
- 01244403634
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window