Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER SAINT PETER

Charity Number: 1174067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jonathan Richard Phillips Chair 01 July 2015
None on record
Timothy David Passey Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
ELIZABETH WIFFEN Trustee 22 April 2024
FRIENDS OF ROSEBANK SCHOOL
Received: On time
Elizabeth Ann Hughes Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Peter Norman Coates Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Joanne Patsy Coates Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
John Anthony Lancaster Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Jane Anne Brocklehurst Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Dr David Godwin Hobson Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Darren Andrews Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
NEVILLE FRANCIS KITE Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
JULIAN DAVID ANNISON Trustee 22 July 2015
None on record