Accounts and annual returns THE LEFT BEHIND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175447
Charity reporting is overdue by 1156 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
Annual return 28 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 426 days
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 426 days
Annual return 28 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days
Annual return 28 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1156 days
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1156 days
Annual return 28 April 2020 15 March 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 15 March 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window