Financial history ST WERBURGH'S DERBY LIMITED

Charity number: 1175502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £829.74k £490.48k £587.28k £432.52k £493.38k
Total expenditure £356.73k £501.48k £506.84k £530.14k £489.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £57.87k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £827.41k N/A £586.49k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £421 N/A £354 N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.92k N/A £436 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £356.73k N/A £506.84k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A