ST WERBURGH'S DERBY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Werburgh's Derby is an Anglican Church in Derby City Centre. Regular public worship open to all. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promoting Christianity and Christian Mission through events and literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip David Mann | Chair | 27 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hope Anna Prestwich | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Myles Lussi | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Garry Strange | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Frances King | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Lois Peters | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Savage | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth David Elliot Towers | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Scott Ramsay | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas Sams | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Lewis | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Crathorne | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £829.74k | £490.48k | £587.28k | £432.52k | £493.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.73k | £501.48k | £506.84k | £530.14k | £489.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £827.41k | N/A | £586.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £421 | N/A | £354 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £1.92k | N/A | £436 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £356.73k | N/A | £506.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANGLICAN PLACE OF WORSHIP IN DERBY AS PART OF THE ESTABLISHMENT, RENEWAL AND REVITALISATION OF CHURCHES WITHIN "THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Werburghs Church
Friar Gate
DERBY
DE1 1BU
- Phone:
- 07838 351075
- Email:
- hello@stwderby.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window