RADLETT & DISTRICT MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity has acquired and stores a comprehensive historic archive of photographs, documents and artefacts relating to Radlett and the other parts of the Civil Parish of Aldenham. These are available to anyone interested in the history of the area. Radlett & District Museum also puts on displays of selected material in other locations, arranges talks and gives guided tours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £4,604 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 October 2017: CIO registration
- RADLETT ARCHIVES GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ros Haller | Chair | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Kathleen Agha | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Freedman | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Wilkins | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JOHN TAYLOR BSC MIEE | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LAURA GAIL DAVIS | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Martin Nagler | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93k | £7.72k | £7.30k | £29.51k | £5.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £3.88k | £2.62k | £2.17k | £2.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.94k | £6.01k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £4.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR IN THE SUBJECT OF RADLETT AND THE OTHER PARTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF ALDENHAM, ITS HISTORY AND HERITAGE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Williams Way
RADLETT
WD7 7HB
- Phone:
- 01923855900
- Email:
- david.mitchell7@virgin.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window