Financial history BLOOMIN' DEMENTIA

Charity number: 1174849
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £56.00k £94.00k £62.26k £43.03k £83.01k
Total expenditure £49.70k £65.00k £64.24k £67.45k £53.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k N/A N/A N/A