BLOOMIN' DEMENTIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Specialist knowledge of dementia care in the community Financial support and benefits accrual Pop in centre for advice and support A choice of local social activities Referral to specialist "person centred" dementia care in the community Family support and respite time A full assessment of the person's needs and a choice of care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennie Foster | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris McManus | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.00k | £94.00k | £62.26k | £43.03k | £83.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.70k | £65.00k | £64.24k | £67.45k | £53.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND RELATED DISORDERS IN NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVISION OF SUPPORT, RESPITE AND SOCIAL INCLUSION, FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND THEIR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Easthorpe Street
Ruddington
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 6LA
- Phone:
- 07753184605
- Email:
- info@bloomindementia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window