Trustees CASTLE HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity Number: 510515

Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Paton-Feaver | Chair | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Horritt | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Tenhoeve | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rohit Mishra | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Banks | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Williams | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Beech | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Calcroft | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arthemise Margaret Dill Hay | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Deahl | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Worrall | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Aldred | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Collins | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jones | Trustee | 29 September 1980 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.