ALL AFLOAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Afloat seeks to change lives through the power of boating. The charity is closely involved with the National Governing Body for boating in Wales (RYA Cymru Wales) and develops, funds and supervises projects in the North, West and South of Wales that provide disadvantaged groups with the chance to try, learn and continue to access boating.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 19 October 2017: CIO registration
- 09 December 2024: Funds received from 1185095 CELTIC CAPABILITY SAILING
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Arthur Tilley | Chair | 25 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Rossina Hearn | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petrina Blomeley | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Lillian Curran | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.19k | £17.04k | £29.47k | £20.02k | £6.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.37k | £12.85k | £15.29k | £20.89k | £17.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2019
(These accounts |
30 October 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR GRANTS FOR PARTICIPATING IN BOATING, AND/OR A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, AND/OR B) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE BOATING BY INDIVIDUALS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES THROUGH COORDINATION AND INTEGRATION WITH THE EXISTING STRUCTURE OF ASSOCIATIONS, CLUBS AND THE RYA RECOGNIZED TRAINING CENTRES WITHIN WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plas Menai National Outdoor Centre
CAERNARFON
Gwynedd
LL55 1UE
- Phone:
- 01248810300
- Email:
- Phil.tilley@all-afloat.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window