SUTTON WALLS CONSERVATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the conservation and management of Sutton Walls Hill Fort sited between Sutton St Nicholas and Marden Villages in the county of Herefordshire. We do this via meetings, talks, walks and conservation work on site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 17 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA MARIA TOON | Chair | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Derek Atkinson | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhiannon Phillips Powell | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER IAN THOMAS | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Keating | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £9.01k | £22.39k | £3.95k | £8.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £7.46k | £22.95k | £3.57k | £7.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE HERITAGE ASSET OF SUTTON WALLS (CAMP) FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS THROUGH SUPPORT TO APPROPRIATE RESTORATION WORK, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marlbank Cottage
Back Lane
Weobley
HEREFORD
HR4 8SG
- Phone:
- 01544 318310
- Email:
- suttonwallscg@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window