SARAH AYOKA ODUWAIYE FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health by educating the public on early awareness of breast cancer, and other cancer-related illnesses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 15 November 2017: Standard registration
- SAOF UK (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr OWODUNNI OLAYINKA ODUWAIYE | Chair | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr AUGUSTINE OBARO | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ADELAJA | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN ODUWAIYE | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.74k | £10.21k | £26.12k | £21.25k | £57.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.99k | £11.43k | £17.15k | £25.35k | £43.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 December 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 January 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 19 January 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 25 January 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 AUG 2017 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND NIGERIA BY: (A) RAISING AWARENESS OF EARLY DETECTION OF BREAST CANCER; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION ON CANCER RELATED TOPICS BY RUNNING QUARTERLY HEALTH WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS; (C) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BROOKEHOWSE ROAD
LONDON
SE6 3TL
- Phone:
- 02083145552
- Email:
- info@saof.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window