NLT TRAINING SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting individuals in the business communities to grow by developing their work related skills through training and development, coaching and mentoring and in some cases providing a financial bursary for those who would be unable to access the training due to poor financial circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 September 1980: Standard registration
- NOTTS AND DERBYS ENGINEERING TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Jane Archbould | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JON WINFIELD | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LOVATT | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Melton | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Oxspring | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.88k | £120.05k | £183.05k | £162.77k | £157.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.42k | £161.88k | £209.41k | £206.14k | £211.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £61.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £54.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JULY 1980 AS AMENDED 20 FEBRUARY 1992, 25 OCTOBER 1996 AND 21 MAY 2007, NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 MARCH 2010 as amended on 08 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ADEQUATE TRAINING OF PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE. ) SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH TRAINING TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEVONSHIRE HOUSE
STATION ROAD
BRIMINGTON
CHESTERFIELD
DERBYSHIRE
S43 1JU
- Phone:
- 03338803540
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window