LEAGUE OF FRIENDS HORNSEA COTTAGE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our remit is to support and provide medical equipment to the hospital and GP surgery when necessary and includes assisting people in our local community with a condition that requires additional aids at home but lack the income to purchase the equipment required. Applications for help must be made in writing to the Secretary and each application will be given due consideration by the committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 31 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAYNE PACE | Chair | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Michele Barkworth | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Barbara Jefferson | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL DAVID STACEY | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
WENDY BARBARA CUDDIHY | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £617 | £500 | £3.38k | £13.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £903 | £300 | £657 | £629 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2024 | 630 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE HORNSEA COTTAGE HOSPITAL (AND OTHER SURROUNDING LOCAL COMMUNITY AND HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTHCARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 AVOCET CLOSE
HORNSEA
HU18 1LG
- Phone:
- 01964229643
- Email:
- wendytrain@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window