BACK TO BASICS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DEMONSTRATING TO THE PUBLIC, IRRESPECTIVE OF AGE OR DISABILITIES, HOW TO GROW THEIR OWN PRODUCE USING ORGANIC AND TRADITIONAL METHODS. PROVIDING A SPACE AND WORKSHOPS WITH QUALIFIED TUTORS IN PERMACULTURE AND HORTICULTURE, IN ORDER TO LEARN FOR THEMSELVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN NGO | Chair | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
KWOK-HO TANG | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/07/2019 | 27/07/2020 | 27/07/2021 | 27/07/2022 | 27/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.35k | £5.24k | £1.64k | £8.16k | £41.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.88k | £5.15k | £1.47k | £7.82k | £36.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 July 2019 | 08 June 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2019 | 08 June 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SANDWELL AND THE UK; BY PROVIDING FACILITIES TO TEACH SKILLS ON EFFECTIVE FARMING AND: PROVIDING GRANTS TO ASSIST THOSE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO TAKE PART IN SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Back to Basics CIO
87 Emerald Suite
Birmingham
West Midlands
B18 6JZ
- Phone:
- 08438498119
- Email:
- contact@backtobasics.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window