FOUX FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants and funding in support of objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 13 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSHUA SEGAL | Chair | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKA FOUX | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ALEXANDRA MAYA FERGUSON | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADAM KENNETH FERGUSON | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.00k | £250.00k | £100.00k | £200.00k | £200.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.05k | £313.09k | £88.91k | £219.22k | £208.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, BEING UNDERTAKEN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE, ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY SUPPORTING CHARITIES TO UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES THAT HAVE A PROVEN BENEFICIAL EFFECT ON HEALTH WITH FOCUS ON MEDICAL TREATMENT AND SUPPORTING NEUROLOGICAL MEDICINE, EQUIPMENT AND MEDICAL RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. B) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PEOPLE OF ALL AGES. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS SUCH AS SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES OR ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTING THE WORK OF EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS, OR ASSOCIATED WITH THEM. D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE. E) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gerald Edelman Chartered Accountant
73 Cornhill
LONDON
EC3V 3QQ
- Phone:
- 0207 2991400
- Email:
- shosier@geraldedelman.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window