TEDDY20 SUPPORTING CHILDREN WITH CANCER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISIONS OF EQUIPMENT FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Somerset
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 September 2017: Standard registration
- 29 May 2020: Funds received from 1157122 TEDDY 20 LEGENDS
- TEDDY20 (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OWEN EDWARD NEWTON | Chair | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alice Miriam Jewer | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Haycox | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
KIM FRANCES NEWTON | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALLY MARY COULING | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £332.39k | £59.13k | £29.33k | £107.14k | £157.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.12k | £50.71k | £40.13k | £50.97k | £72.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 AUG 2017 as amended on 04 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISIONS OF EQUIPMENT FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Westbury Way
Blandford Forum
DT11 7DH
- Phone:
- 07870357417
- Email:
- info@teddy20.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window