SHEFFIELD BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open to all applicants our Association provides opportunities for all members of the public to be involved in life long learning, animal husbandry and conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 31 August 2017: CIO registration
- SBKA (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD BKA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH ROMANOWSKI | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Zeidler | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nigel Dalton | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dorothy Vaughan Birks | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELINOR TURNER | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JEMILIANOWICZ | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY DALE | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.93k | £45.56k | £38.19k | £46.90k | £51.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.30k | £37.98k | £24.25k | £34.78k | £47.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £526 | £553 | £90 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Aug 2017 as amended on 01 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: A) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF AMATEUR BEEKEEPING, B) TO RAISE AWARENESS AND EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE IMPORTANCE OF BEES AND BEEKEEPING TO THE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leam Farm
Leam
Grindleford
HOPE VALLEY
Derbyshire
S32 2HL
- Phone:
- 07544147404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window