THE STRAW LODGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING A SANCTUARY OFFERING SUCH SERVICES, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO THOSE WHO ARE AT INCREASED RISK OF SUICIDE AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kyle Immanuel | Chair | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE EMILY DUFFY | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £270 | £0 | £696 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £72 | £100 | £188 | £419 | £30 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING A SANCTUARY OFFERING SUCH SERVICES, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO THOSE WHO ARE AT INCREASED RISK OF SUICIDE AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Elford Place East
LEEDS
LS8 5QB
- Phone:
- 07923467394
- Email:
- hello@thestrawlodge.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window