CHURCHER'S COLLEGE

Charity number: 1173833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Charity (Object) is to advance education, including but not exclusively by providing a school or schools in or near Petersfield. The Charity has been established to replace an unincorporated charity Churcher's College Petersfield (307320)(the "Trust"). The Charity will hold the unrestricted assets and liabilities of the Trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Coke Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
Katherine Fiona Mitchell Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Dr Andrew William Cairns Trustee 20 January 2025
None on record
Sarah Myfanwy Thomas Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Justine Morris Trustee 14 March 2024
None on record
Chloe Jay Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Matthew Steven Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Tarquin Henderson Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Robert Ingram Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Charles Strick Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Peter Lawrence Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
DIANE MARIE MOSES Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record
WILLIAM JONES Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record
JOANNE BLOOMER Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record
ROBERT MAY Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record
MARK STEPHEN LEIGH Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record
JOHN RICHARD FRANKLIN Trustee 16 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £18.27m £18.43m £20.43m £22.19m £25.51m
Total expenditure £16.33m £16.98m £19.15m £21.70m £23.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £221.65k £143.27k £284.81k £344.41k £562.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £154.22k £197.65k £225.25k
Income - Charitable activities £17.59m £18.06m £19.94m £21.60m £24.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35.13k £34.97k £46.47k £45.91k £124.86k
Income - Other £426.76k £198.13k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £327.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.15m £16.79m £18.88m £21.24m £22.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.00k £18.30k £17.75k £23.08k £59.76k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £30.47k £103.75k £120.82k £99.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £158.47k £170.70k £254.21k £435.33k £328.57k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £24.56m £28.86m £30.68m £30.58m £30.05m
Long-term investments £803.59k £962.12k £962.56k £961.26k £8.02m
Other assets £1.17m £882.24k £1.91m £828.66k £3.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£213.74k -£195.97k -£178.20k £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.82m £9.39m £11.64m £11.38m £17.85m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10TH JANUARY 1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME MODIFICATION ORDER OF 20 APRIL 1988 AND AMENDED 26TH APRIL 1994 AND AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 2003. TRUSTEES INCORPORATED - REFER TO REGISTER STAFF FOR DETAILS.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF PETERSFIELD FOR A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 October 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
CHURCHERS COLLEGE
RAMSHILL
PETERSFIELD
GU31 4AS
Phone:
01730263033