Financial history THE NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 510538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £43.81k £71.02k £53.08k £59.04k £63.35k
Total expenditure £70.73k £65.16k £45.83k £53.10k £61.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A