THE NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote family history and assist all those indviduals who wish to research their family history. This is facilitated through members of the society and anyone from the general public using the research centre and library, and through postal enquiries.The society holds family history events in the community within the two counties. There is a very active branch network, meetings open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Durham
- Northumberland
Governance
- 09 September 1980: Standard registration
- NDFHS (Working name)
- NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOYCE JACKMAN | Chair | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Meades | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Pallister Richardson | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Julienne Veronica Lisle | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Heckels | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Brooks Mrs | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John HARRISON | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Kevin JOHNSON | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL TRINDER | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Michelle Cunningham | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr RHODA LEE | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Hewitt | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN EDWARD HECKELS | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN FRANKLIN | Trustee | 06 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WARD BA PGCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.81k | £71.02k | £53.08k | £59.04k | £63.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.73k | £65.16k | £45.83k | £53.10k | £61.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1980. AS AMENDED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 13TH JUNE 2000 AND BY SCHEME DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 2005 as amended on 11 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY IN THE HISTORICAL COUNTIES OF NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND AND DURHAM AND ADJACENT AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
New England House
Ridley Place
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE1 8JW
- Phone:
- 01912612159
- Email:
- secretary@ndfhs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window