CITIZENS ADVICE GREATER MANCHESTER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the health and benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty and distress in particular, but without limitation for the benefit of the community in Greater Manchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 17 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Warrington | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Allen | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lance Walker | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Jane Lightup | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverly D'Alessio | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Alan Ferns | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Isobel McNair | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Norman Mackie | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JANE MARGARET MCGARRY | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.66k | £152.61k | £162.73k | £175.02k | £7.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.22k | £91.56k | £202.90k | £133.60k | £62.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £100.00k | £119.01k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 MAY 2017 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND SURROUND AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Langworthy Cornerstone Ltd
Langworthy Centre
451 Liverpool Street
SALFORD
Greater Manchester
M6 5QQ
- Phone:
- 07944394103
- Email:
- info@citizensadvicegm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window