WESTCLIFF NATIONAL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1174054
Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a place of worship where religious services can be conducted in accordance with the Spiritualist National Union.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £2,518
Total expenditure: £3,830

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GLORIA MILLIS Chair 07 April 2019
None on record
William Fletcher Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
NANETTE CLEMENTS Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Dianne Fletcher Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.03k £10.37k £2.52k
Total expenditure £16.69k £11.98k £3.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Westcliff Spiritualist Church
320 Westborough Road
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 9PZ
Phone:
01279816363