Financial history SUNDERLAND LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1174385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.50k £1.29k £948 £6.70k £6.98k
Total expenditure £11.11k £3.91k £1.84k £3.25k £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £450 £160 N/A £1.00k