Taqasim Music Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Taqasim Music Foundation was established to preserve, share and spread an appreciation of the rich musical traditions of the Middle East. It is there to promote national and international musicians, for the benefit of the artistic community and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 04 January 2018: CIO registration
- TAQASIM FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruba Hillawi | Chair | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Saunders | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
AHMED MUKHTAR ALSAADY | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HUGHES-SMITH | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ignacio Lusardi Monteverde | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Dumbrill | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.57k | £0 | £3.28k | £108 | £29.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £100 | £10.13k | £200 | £19.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | N/A | £38 | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jan 2018 as amended on 11 Nov 2021 as amended on 11 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, OUD (ARABIAN LUTE) PLAYING AND ALL ASPECTS OF ARABIAN MUSICAL ARTS AND POETRY IN GENERAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 SINGLETON ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM9 5EP
- Phone:
- 07958747917
- Email:
- foundation@taqasim.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window