THE BROMSGROVE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes awards to architectural developments of merit, holds talks, lectures, meetings and summer a school, makes grants towards the presevation of historic buildings and monuments, and makes representations to public and other authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ms Jo Slade | Chair | 02 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Julian Matthew Dyer | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Claire Beaumont | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
John Christian Gerner | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Mike Sharpe | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||
ALASTAIR MOSELEY | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Jenny Townshend | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
JULIAN MORAY HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PATRICIA ANNE TANSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.84k | £6.29k | £6.65k | £11.61k | £17.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.62k | £10.45k | £13.73k | £7.48k | £13.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1980
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARD OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BROMSGROVE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ormerod Rutter Accountants Llp
48 Birmingham Road
BROMSGROVE
Worcestershire
B61 0DD
- Phone:
- 07738729348
- Email:
- juliandyer@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window