FRIENDS OF FACE 2 FACE CORNWALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide emotional support and signposting to parents and carers of children and young people 0-25 through groups, telephone and virtually by trained parent befrienders who have experienced the same emotions and feelings associated with parenting and caring for a child with additional needs or a disability. the same
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 18 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET KEVERN | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE BEVERLEY MORETON | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATH PERRY | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JANE KINSMAN | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE FAY PEARN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £5.23k | £4.34k | £3.89k | £3.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.86k | £6.51k | £3.87k | £3.99k | £3.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2024 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2024 | 450 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2023 | 427 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2023 | 427 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 423 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A BEFRIENDING SERVICE PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVOCACY AND SUPPORT TO PARENTS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND SUPPORT GROUPS AND ACTIVITIES FOR DISABLED CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Church Road
Pool
REDRUTH
Cornwall
TR15 3PT
- Phone:
- 07917715920
- Email:
- friendsofface2face@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window