Financial history 4 X 4 ASSIST

Charity number: 1174438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.41k £1.66k £311 £655 £2.30k
Total expenditure £3.33k £3.78k £335 £757 £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A