CITIZENAID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
set up by four philanthropic clinicians, citizenAID is a UK registered charity with a focused mission to prepare individuals, communities and organisations to help themselves and each other when there are multiple casualties, particularly from deliberate attacks. citizenAID recognise that this system is fully transferable to any situation where there are multiple casualties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven John Bray | Chair | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew William Cooke | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aurelie Hay-David | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Craig Barraclough | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FREDERICK FERNLEY | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Hodgetts | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|||||
KEITH PORTER | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.21k | £26.01k | £28.32k | £85.92k | £22.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.71k | £31.90k | £28.57k | £73.49k | £31.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING FREE TO ACCESS INFORMATION, OUTLINING A SIMPLE, LOGICAL SYSTEM OF IMMEDIATE ACTIONS DESIGNED TO GUIDE THE PUBLIC TO REACT SAFELY, TO PASS EFFECTIVE MESSAGES TO THE EMERGENCY SERVICES, TO PRIORITISE THE INJURED AND TO GIVE LIFESAVING FIRST AID, KNOWN AS THE CITIZENAID GUIDE 2. PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION ON LIFE SAVING FIRST AID TECHNIQUES IN MASS CASUALTY SITUATIONS, LEARNING FROM THE EXPERIENCES OF MILITARY AND CIVILIAN CLINICIANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
citizenAID
The Workspace
All Saints Road
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 1EL
- Phone:
- 0773252636
- Email:
- info@citizenaid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window