Financial history LIVING AUTISM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.70k £1.45k £1.72k £686 £548
Total expenditure £400 £898 £1.50k £1.10k £1.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A