FRIZINGHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the establishment of a community centre and to maintain and manage or to co-operate with the local statutory authority in the maintenance and management of such a centre for the activities promoted by the Centre and its constituent bodies in the furtherance of the above objectives and to hold necessary land or property on behalf of the centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,955 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 17 January 2018: CIO registration
- FRIZINGHALL COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAFAR MAHMOOD | Chair | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD KHAN | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liaqat Ali Khan | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.47k | £63.23k | £112.71k | £95.25k | £90.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.05k | £53.28k | £68.69k | £76.80k | £84.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | £38.46k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £350 | £63.23k | £90.61k | N/A | £61.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FRIZINGHALL NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON FORM TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTAINANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CENTRE AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES AND TO HOLD NECESSARY LAND OR PROPERTY ON BEHALF OF THE CENTRE. 3) THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE FRIZIGHALL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD. CLEARLY SPECIFIED IN MAP BOUNDARY (APPENDIX 1)
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIZINGHALL COMMUNITY CENTRE
MIDLAND ROAD
FRIZINGHALL
BRADFORD
BD9 4HX
- Phone:
- 01274480934
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window