FIRST HOPE FAMILIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.To relieve the distress and suffering faced by young people, individuals and families who have experienced, or at risk of experiencing Domestic Abuse by the provision of emotional support, practical help, early intervention, skills and empowerment. 2. The advancement of education and understanding the issue of Domestic Abuse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kashmere Joseph | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA BERTHIER | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Croney | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hywel Stanislaus | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.31k | £100 | £500 | £0 | £850 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.74k | £3.94k | £498 | £0 | £850 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 June 2023 | 486 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 June 2023 | 486 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2023 | 851 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2023 | 851 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING FACED BY YOUNG PEOPLE, INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED, OR ARE AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING DOMESTIC ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, PRACTICAL HELP, EARLY INTERVENTION, SKILLS AND EMPOWERMENT. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES OF DOMESTIC ABUSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ARK CENTRE
MARSH HOUSE
500 MONTAGU ROAD
LONDON
N9 0UR
- Phone:
- 07398668742
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window